VA HB926 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Behavior analysis; licensure. Establishes the Advisory Board on Behavior Analysis to advise the Board of Medicine on issues related to licensure of behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts and provides that certain persons may perform behavior analysis as part of their program of study.
Title
Behavior analyst; exceptions to licensure requirements, Advisory Board established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 89 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 89 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 584 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB926ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (87-Y 12-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB926H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104200D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed by until February 10, 2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104200D-H1 |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 4-N) |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102544D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2957.17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |