VA HB919 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; course credit. Makes several changes relating to course credit at public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth, including requiring (i) the Virginia Community College System to develop a 15-credit-hour Passport Program and a 30-credit-hour Uniform Certificate of General Studies Program to be offered at each comprehensive community college and for which courses are transferable, except in certain circumstances, to each baccalaureate public institution of higher education and (ii) each baccalaureate public institution of higher education to develop pathway maps that clearly set forth the courses that a student at a comprehensive community college is encouraged to complete prior to transferring to the baccalaureate institution. This bill is identical to SB 631.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Community College System; changes to ensure a standard quality of education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 832 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB919ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2018-04-09HouseGovernor's substitute printed 18108369D-H1
2018-04-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB919ER)
2018-03-09HouseEnrolled
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseSenate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 18107784D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-06SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB919S1
2018-03-06SenateAmendment by Senator Newman agreed to
2018-03-06SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-03-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107784D-S1
2018-03-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-06SenateRead third time
2018-03-05SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107784D-S1
2018-03-01SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18101739D-E
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB919E
2018-02-12HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101739D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231203(n/a)See Bill Text
2312904(n/a)See Bill Text
2312906.1(n/a)See Bill Text
2313136(n/a)See Bill Text
2313137(n/a)See Bill Text
231907(n/a)See Bill Text
231908(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB919
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB919+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB919E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB919S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB919ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB919H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB919ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0832+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0206V0011+HB0919
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0035+HB0919
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0677+HB0919
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0307+HB0919
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB0919+HB0919
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0973HB0919+HB0919
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1455+HB0919
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1650+HB0919
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1254HB0919+HB0919
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1255HB0919+HB0919
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1256HB0919+HB0919

Bill Comments

feedback