VA HB917 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Neighborhood assistance tax credits. Reduces the amount of the tax credit from 65 percent of the value of donations to neighborhood organizations for taxable years 2012 through 2016 to (i) 60 percent for taxable year 2017, (ii) 55 percent for taxable year 2018, and (iii) 50 percent for taxable year 2019 and taxable years thereafter.
Title
Neighborhood Assistance Act; reduces tax credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Left in Finance |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101119D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB917 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB917+hil |