VA HB916 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0218)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0218)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health care providers; health records of minors; available via secure website. Provides that every hospital and health care provider that makes patients' health records available to such patients through a secure website shall make all health records of a patient who is a minor available to such patient's parent through such secure website unless the hospital or health care provider cannot make such health record available in a manner that prevents disclosure of information, the disclosure of which has been denied by a health care provider or for which required consent has not been provided. Health care providers; health records of minors; available via secure website. Provides that every hospital and health care provider that makes patients' health records available to such patients through a secure website shall make all health records of a patient who is a minor available to such patient's parent through such secure website unless the hospital or health care provider cannot make such health record available in a manner that prevents disclosure of information, the disclosure of which has been denied by a health care provider or for which required consent has not been provided.
Title
Health care providers; health records of minors, available via secure website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0218) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 218 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB916ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (95-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB916H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105695D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105695D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100910D |