VA HB909 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; prohibited discrimination; national origin. Provides that a landlord may not discriminate against any person in the terms, conditions, or privileges with respect to the rental of a dwelling unit, or in the provision of services or facilities in the connection therewith, to any person because of such person's national origin.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; prohibited discrimination, national origin.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in General Laws |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103092D |