VA HB909 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driver's license suspensions for certain non-driving related offenses. Removes the existing provisions that allow a person's driver's license to be suspended (i) when he is convicted of or placed on deferred disposition for a drug offense, (ii) for non-payment of certain fees owed to a local correctional facility or regional jail, and (iii) for shoplifting motor fuel.
Title
Driver's license; suspensions for certain non-driving related offenses.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 5-N) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 5-N) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 740 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB909ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 35-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 20102919D-E |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB909E |
2020-02-10 | House | Amendment by Delegate Simon agreed to |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102919D |
Same As/Similar To
SB513 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 259.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 320.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 390.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 410.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 416.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |