VA HB909 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; disclosure of law-enforcement and criminal records. Clarifies that the discretionary exemptions contained in the Freedom of Information Act pertaining to law-enforcement and criminal records may be used by any public body. Current law only permits such exemptions to be used by public bodies engaged in criminal law-enforcement activities. The bill also restricts the application of the discretionary exemption for those portions of noncriminal incident or other noncriminal investigative reports or materials that contain identifying information of a personal, medical, or financial nature, the release of which would jeopardize the safety or privacy of any person, to only those portions of noncriminal incident or other noncriminal investigative reports or materials that are in the possession of public bodies (i) engaged in emergency medical services, (ii) engaged in fire protection services, (iii) engaged in criminal law-enforcement activities, or (iv) engaged in processing calls for service or other communications to an emergency 911 system or any other equivalent reporting system. This bill is a recommendation of the Freedom of Information Advisory Council.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; disclosure of law-enforcement and criminal records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 48 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 1, 2018 | |
2018-02-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/22/18 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB909ER) |
2018-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101273D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1713.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |