VA HB904 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Pound. Repeals the charter for the Town of Pound in Wise County. The bill has a delayed effective date of November 1, 2023. Charter; Town of Pound. Repeals the charter for the Town of Pound in Wise County. The bill has a delayed effective date of November 1, 2023.
Title
Pound, Town of; repealing Charter, effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 312 (effective 11/1/23) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB904ER) |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22102042D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB904E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102042D |