VA HB904 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0461)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0461)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child abuse and neglect reporting; public sports programs. Adds to the list of mandatory reporters of suspected child abuse and neglect athletic coaches, directors, and other persons 18 years of age or older that are employed by or volunteering with a public sports organization or team. Current law applies only to such individuals involved with private sports organizations or teams.
Title
Child abuse and neglect reporting; public sports programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 3-N) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0461) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 461 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB904ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-27 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100216D |