VA HB901 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Transportation to develop and submit for approval an expedited land use permit process; rights-of-way. Report. Directs the Department of Transportation (Department) to develop and submit for approval to the Federal Highway Administration an expedited land use permit process by which public or private utility companies that offer communication services can apply to use any right-of-way of the Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expedited land use permit process; Dept. of Transportation shall develop and submit for approval.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0505)
2018-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 505 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB901ER)
2018-03-08HouseEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-03-05SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-03-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateReported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-01-29HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-01-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB901H1
2018-01-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105386D-H1
2018-01-26HouseRead second time
2018-01-25HouseRead first time
2018-01-23HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105386D-H1
2018-01-23HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101048D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB901
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB901+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB901H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB901ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0505+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H14V0022+HB0901
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0107+HB0901
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S10V0147+HB0901
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB0901+HB0901
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0885HB0901+HB0901
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1369+HB0901

Bill Comments

feedback