VA HB9 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Safety restraint use in motor vehicles. Requires all occupants of motor vehicles to utilize safety restraints. Current law requires safety belt use only by occupants under the age of 18, drivers, and passengers 18 years of age or older occupying the front seat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safety restraints; all occupants of motor vehicles required to utilize.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Transportation
2018-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-11-20HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100423D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621094(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback