VA HB895 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0443)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0443)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; conduct of election; election results; risk-limiting audits. Requires local electoral boards and general registrars to perform certain risk-limiting audits, defined in the bill, under the supervision of the Department of Elections and in accordance with the procedures prescribed by the State Board of Elections with a risk limit of at least 10 percent. The bill provides that localities are required to participate in such audits at least once every five years. The bill also provides that the Department shall submit a report on the results of such audits to the State Board. The provisions of the bill requiring that such audits be conducted (i) for at least one randomly selected contested race for the General Assembly in the year of a general election for members of the General Assembly and (ii) for any other contested race that is necessary to ensure that each locality participates in a risk-limiting audit of an office within its jurisdiction at least once every five years or that the State Board finds appropriate have a delayed effective date of July 1, 2023. The provision of the bill requiring that such audits be conducted for at least one randomly selected contested race for an office that requires certification by the State Board in the year of general election for any local office has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2024. The bill also requires the Department to convene a work group to consider and propose a process and timeline for implementing risk-limiting audits of statewide contests.
Title
Elections; local electoral boards & general registrars to perform certain risk-limiting audits, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0443) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 443 (effective - see bill) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB895ER) |
2022-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB895H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105719D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105719D-H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104191D |
Same As/Similar To
SB370 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
SB370 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
SB370 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 669 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 671 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 671.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 671.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 679 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |