VA HB892 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB892

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms; taxation. Provides that peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms, as defined in the bill, are rentors for the purposes of taxation. Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms; taxation. Provides that peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms, as defined in the bill, are rentors for the purposes of taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms; definition, taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Finance
2020-02-05HouseContinued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-31HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102554D

Same As/Similar To

HB892 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5811735(n/a)See Bill Text
5811738(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback