VA HB891 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Noncitizens of the United States; terminology. Removes the term "alien" as it pertains to persons who are not citizens or nationals of the United States and replaces it with synonymous language, as appropriate, throughout the Code of Virginia. Noncitizens of the United States; terminology. Removes the term "alien" as it pertains to persons who are not citizens or nationals of the United States and replaces it with synonymous language, as appropriate, throughout the Code of Virginia.
Title
Noncitizens of the United States; removes certain terminology in the Code of Va.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 19-N) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 19-N) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB891ER) |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (78-Y 19-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (78-Y 19-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB891H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106414D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106414D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100335D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Corporations
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Health
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Corporations
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Health
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 1050.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1056.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1238.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1246.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 753 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 769 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 915 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 931 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 294.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 81.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4311.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 287 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 325.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 6500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 11.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 328.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
47 | 1 | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 220.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 220.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 2107.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |