VA HB891 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms; regulation; insurance; taxation. Establishes taxation, insurance coverage, sale of insurance, disclosure, safety recall, airport operation, and recordkeeping requirements for peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms, as defined in the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms; establishes sale of insurance, etc., for platforms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Finance
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N)
2020-01-31HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-01-27HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-27HouseReferred from Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105150D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3821800(n/a)See Bill Text
4622099.54(n/a)See Bill Text
4622099.64(n/a)See Bill Text
5811735(n/a)See Bill Text
5811736(n/a)See Bill Text
5811738(n/a)See Bill Text
5812402(n/a)See Bill Text
591207.29(n/a)See Bill Text
591207.31(n/a)See Bill Text
591207.32(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback