VA HB891 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - Senate: Left in Courts of Justice
Summary
Discretionary arrest for third offense of driving on a suspended license. Provides that an officer may, at his discretion, arrest a person for driving on a suspended license if the person has been twice previously convicted thereof.
Title
Driver's license; discretionary arrest for third offense of driving on suspended license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-03 | Senate: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-07 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB891H1 | |
2008-02-06 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080869604-H1 | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 080869604-H1 | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-15 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-15 | House: Referred from Transportation by voice vote | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084607604 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB891 |