VA HB889 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Tethering of dogs; local ordinance. Authorizes the governing body of any locality to adopt an ordinance restricting the tethering of a dog outdoors. The ordinance may limit the maximum number of hours or the weather conditions during which the dog may remain tethered but shall not restrict normal hunting or agricultural activities. The bill provides that its provisions shall not repeal, amend, impair, or affect any tethering ordinance adopted prior to July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dogs, tethering of; locality authorized to adopt an ordinance to restrict.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseFailed to pass in House
2018-03-10HouseNo further action taken
2018-03-08SenateChair ruled substitute not properly before the Senate
2018-03-07HouseSpeaker ruled substitute 18107983D-S1 not germane
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-06SenatePassed Senate with substitute (33-Y 6-N)
2018-03-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB889S1
2018-03-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107983D-S1
2018-03-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-06SenateRead third time
2018-03-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107983D-S1
2018-03-01SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 6-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 48-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB889H1
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106867D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-09HouseRead first time
2018-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106867D-H1
2018-02-07HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
2018-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 3-N)
2018-01-25HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101099D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326538.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB889
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB889+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB889H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB889S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0101V0023+HB0889
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0101V0025+HB0889
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H01V0049+HB0889
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0718+HB0889
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S01V0108+HB0889
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0925HB0889+HB0889
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0983HB0889+HB0889

Bill Comments

feedback