VA HB884 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Treatment pursuant to judicial order; when provider not liable. Provides that a health care professional or licensed hospital shall not be liable for any cause of action arising from a claim that a person who received treatment pursuant to an emergency custody, temporary detention, or involuntary commitment order was not capable of consenting to such treatment or from a claim that a person who consented to treatment lacked the capacity to consent, if a judge or special justice has denied a petition for an emergency custody, temporary detention, or involuntary commitment order.
Title
Treatment pursuant to judicial order; when provider not liable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102726D |