VA HB882 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant's assertion; condemnation of dwelling unit; remedies. Provides a rebuttable presumption of a landlord's material noncompliance with the rental agreement if the leased premises was condemned by an appropriate state or local agency due to the landlord's or his agent's refusal or failure to remedy a condition for which he was served a condemnation notice. The bill requires a court, when such rebuttable presumption is established, to award the tenant the amount of three months' rent, any prepaid rent, and any security deposit paid by the tenant.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; tenant's assertion, condemnation of dwelling unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in General Laws |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Agree To (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Rereferred to General Laws |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102913D |