VA HB879 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conveyance of easement. Authorizes the Department of Wildlife Resources to grant and convey an easement and right-of-way at Land's End Wildlife Management Area to Joseph C. Frank III, Betty J. Frank, Jacob C. Ackerman, and Crystal F. Ackerman. The easement will allow ingress and egress from State Route 625 (Salem Church Road) to the grantees' properties. Conveyance of easement. Authorizes the Department of Wildlife Resources to grant and convey an easement and right-of-way at Land's End Wildlife Management Area to Joseph C. Frank III, Betty J. Frank, Jacob C. Ackerman, and Crystal F. Ackerman. The easement will allow ingress and egress from State Route 625 (Salem Church Road) to the grantees' properties.
Title
Land's End Wildlife Mgmt. Area; DWR to grant & convey an ingress-egress easement & right-of-way.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0073) | |
2024-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 73 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB879ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100731D |