VA HB877 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pet shops; sale of dogs; maintenance and availability of records. Amends the definition of "pet shop" to clarify that such entity is a "retail" establishment and requires any pet shop that sells dogs to post a notice stating that USDA's Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service (APHIS) inspection reports are available prior to purchase. The bill requires the shop to (i) maintain a written record containing such reports and other detailed information about each dog for at least two years after the date of sale of the dog, (ii) make the record available to purchasers and other specified parties, and (iii) transmit certain information for dogs obtained from a breeder or dealer or a private or public animal shelter to the local animal control officer upon request.
Title
Pet shops; sale of dogs, maintenance and availability of records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 780 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB877ER) |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-09 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-09 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-09 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: Stanley, Hanger, Marsden |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: Orrock, Marshall, Keam |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate amendment #3 rejected by House (0-Y 96-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate amendments #1 and #2 agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment from Finance agreed to |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendments from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources agreed to |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 18104178D-E |
2018-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB877E |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104178D |