VA HB876 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB876
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription drug price transparency. Requires every health carrier, pharmacy benefits manager, wholesale drug distributer, and drug manufacturer to report information about prescription drug prices and related information to the Department of Health and requires the Department to make such information available on its website.
Title
Prescription drugs; price transparency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-04 | House | Continued to 2021 with substitute in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104912D |
Same As/Similar To
HB876 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 with substitute in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 23.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.15:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3436.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |