VA HB875 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veterinarians; compounding of drugs. Increases the quantity, from a 72-hour supply to a seven-day supply, of a compounded drug that a veterinarian may dispense to the owner of a companion animal for which the veterinarian is providing treatment.
Title
Veterinarians; compounding of drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 100 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB875ER) |
2018-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102431D |