VA HB871 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB871
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Robbery; penalty. Defines "robbery" and creates degrees of punishment corresponding to the severity of a robbery offense. Any person who commits a robbery by causing serious bodily injury is guilty of robbery in the first degree, which is punishable by confinement in a state correctional facility for a maximum term of life. Any person who commits robbery by displaying a firearm in a threatening manner is guilty of robbery in the second degree, which is punishable by confinement in a state correctional facility for a maximum term of 20 years. Any person who commits robbery by using physical force not resulting in serious bodily injury, or by displaying a deadly weapon other than a firearm in a threatening manner, is guilty of robbery in the third degree, which is punishable as a Class 5 felony. Any person who commits robbery by using threat or intimidation not involving a deadly weapon is guilty of robbery in the fourth degree, which is punishable as a Class 6 felony. Under current law, any robbery is punishable by confinement in a state correctional facility for life or any term not less than five years.
Title
Robbery; definition, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100430D |
Same As/Similar To
HB871 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote