VA HB87 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth priority of projects and funding. Provides that all state funds expended on transportation projects be for (i) projects expected to provide congestion reduction or (ii) projects that increase safety for travelers.
Title
Transportation; Commonwealth priority of projects and funding.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Transportation |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-12-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100843D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB87 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB87+hil |