VA HB866 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Scenic river designations. Consolidates provisions of the Scenic Rivers Act relating to prohibitions on the construction of dams and limits on the effects of the Act. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Scenic river designations; consolidates provisions of Scenic Rivers Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 273 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB866ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100023D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 418.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5704.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |