VA HB865 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Building service employees; transition period. Permits any county, city, or town in the Commonwealth to provide for certain requirements concerning incumbent and successor building service employers by local ordinance or resolution. For example, such local ordinance or resolution may require that successor building service employers retain incumbent employees during a transition period of 90 days. Under the bill, building service employees are those who perform work in connection with the care or maintenance of property. A building service employer who violates the provisions of a local ordinance or resolution enacted pursuant to the bill may be subject to a civil action and monetary damages.
Title
Building service employees; transition period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102961D |