VA HB863 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; admission of undergraduate students domiciled in Virginia. Requires the governing board of each public institution of higher education, except for the Virginia Military Institute, Norfolk State University, and Virginia State University, to establish policies requiring that at least 75 percent of undergraduate students admitted to the institution have established domicile in Virginia. The bill requires each such governing board to recover any lost revenue caused by this requirement by increasing the tuition charged to out-of-state undergraduate students. The bill requires compliance with such requirements and policies beginning no later than June 30, 2021.
Title
Higher educational institutions; admission of undergraduate students domiciled in Virginia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Education |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101301D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB863 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB863+hil |