VA HB862 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Guardianship; communication between close relatives and Guardianship; communication between close relatives and friends of incapacitated persons; restricted communication procedures; notification of close relatives and friends. Provides that a guardian may restrict an incapacitated person's ability to communicate with, visit, or interact with close relatives, as defined in the bill, and friends, as defined in the bill, only when necessary to prevent a reasonable expectation of serious physical or psychological harm or serious financial exploitation occurring to the incapacitated person. The bill further sets up a procedure by which a person whose visits, communication with, or interaction with an incapacitated person have been restricted may challenge such restriction in court and a procedure by which a guardian may petition the court to restrict an incapacitated person's communication, visitation, and interaction rights with a close relative or friend. The bill provides that the court may restrict an incapacitated person's communication, visitation, and interaction rights with such person when it finds by clear and convincing evidence that serious physical or psychological harm or serious financial exploitation would reasonably be expected to occur to such incapacitated person from such communication, visitation, or interaction. The bill allows the court to require a guardian found to have imposed restrictions or brought such a petition in bad faith or not for the benefit of the incapacitated person to pay or reimburse all or some of the incapacitated person's reasonable costs and fees. The bill also specifies that such a finding may be grounds for termination of the guardianship appointment. The bill requires the guardian to notify close relatives and friends of the incapacitated person of certain life events of the incapacitated person, unless the guardian is notified in writing that any such close relative or friend does not wish to be notified or if there exists between such close relative or friend and the incapacitated person a protective

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardianship; communication between close relatives and friends of incapacitated persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-01-31HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N)
2020-01-30HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104790D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6422000(n/a)See Bill Text
6422002(n/a)See Bill Text
6422007(n/a)See Bill Text
6422019(n/a)See Bill Text
6422019.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback