VA HB853 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0118)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0118)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Saltwater recreational fishing license; member of Indian tribe exempt. Exempts from the requirements of obtaining a saltwater recreational fishing license and a commercial gear license for recreational purposes any person who is a member of an American Indian tribe that is recognized by the Commonwealth. The bill requires such person to carry an identification card or other documentation of the fact that he is a member of the tribe and provides that such documentation shall create a presumption of residence in Virginia that may be rebutted by proof of actual residence elsewhere.
Title
Saltwater recreational fishing license; member of an American Indian tribe exempt.
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Peace [R] | Del. James Edmunds [R] | Del. Keith Hodges [R] | Del. Brenda Pogge [R] |
Del. Robert Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0118) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 118 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB853ER) |
2018-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101425D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2 | 226.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 302.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |