VA HB852 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Information Technologies Agency; required information security training program for state employees. Requires the Chief Information Officer of the Virginia Information Technologies Agency (the CIO) to develop by November 30, 2020, and annually update a curriculum and materials for training all state employees in information security awareness and in proper procedures for detecting, assessing, reporting, and addressing information security threats. The bill requires the Commonwealth's executive, legislative, and judicial branches and independent agencies, beginning January 1, 2021, to provide annual information security training for each of its employees using the curriculum and materials developed by the CIO.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VITA; required information security training program for state employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 1-N) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB852ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate (35-Y 1-N)
2020-02-28SenateRead third time
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-06HouseVOTE: Passage (78-Y 21-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House (78-Y 21-N)
2020-02-05HousePrinted as engrossed 20100248D-E
2020-02-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB852E
2020-02-05HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-05HouseRead second time
2020-02-04HouseRead first time
2020-01-31HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-27HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment (16-Y 6-N)
2020-01-27HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2020-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned CT & I sub: Communications
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100248D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222009(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB852&201+sum+HB852
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB852+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB852E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB852ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H2101V0006+HB0852
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H21V0013+HB0852
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0202V0020+HB0852
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0077+HB0852
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0475+HB0852
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0187+HB0852
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0460+HB0852
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1203HB0852+HB0852
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1281HB0852+HB0852

Bill Comments

feedback