VA HB849 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; geothermal tax credit. Establishes an Income tax; geothermal tax credit. Establishes an individual income tax credit for taxable years 2023 through 2027 for qualified expenditures related to a geothermal system placed in service at a residence in a tobacco region locality. The bill provides that the geothermal tax credit amount is the lesser of $7,500 or 25 percent of qualified expenditures. The aggregate annual limit on such credits is $1 million. The bill directs the Department of Energy to evaluate whether a person's geothermal system complies with statutory and regulatory standards and to issue a certification for a compliant system to be attached to a person's income tax return in order to claim the geothermal tax credit. The bill reduces from 50 percent to 25 percent the portion of Master Settlement Agreement funds that accrue to the Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Fund and allocates 25 percent of such funds to cover the revenue loss attributable to the credit created by the bill. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023.
Title
Income tax, state; establishes geothermal tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 6-N) (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Finance |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 6-N) |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100075D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 3100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 339.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |