VA HB845 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB845

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation (13-Y 1-N)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Definition of law-enforcement officer; certain employees of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority. Adds special agents employed by the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Office of the Inspector General to the definition of law-enforcement officer. The bill also grants such individuals the same authority and power as sheriffs to enforce the laws of the Commonwealth. Such individuals shall not be eligible for Line of Duty Act benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement officer definition; certain employees of Washington Metro Area Transit Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Transportation (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateContinued to 2021 in Transportation (13-Y 1-N)
2020-02-27SenateCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 20109367D-S1
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (87-Y 11-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (87-Y 11-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB845H2
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 20107912D-H2
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on Public Safety substitute rejected 20105880D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107912D-H2
2020-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2020-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 20105880D-H1
2020-01-24HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
2020-01-22HouseAssigned PS sub: Public Safety
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-16HouseReferred from General Laws by voice vote
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101768D

Same As/Similar To

HB845 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation (13-Y 1-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91101(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB845
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB845+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB845H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB845H2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB845S1+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB845FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB845FH2122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1502C0004+HB0845
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H15C0015+HB0845
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0202C0052+HB0845
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02C0292+HB0845
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HC0847+HB0845
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S11C0093+HB0845

Bill Comments

feedback