VA HB842 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Teacher preparation and licensure; dyslexia and other learning disabilities. Requires Board of Education regulations governing teacher licensure to require every person seeking initial licensure or renewal of a license to complete awareness training, provided by the Department of Education, on the indicators of dyslexia and the evidence-based interventions and accommodations for dyslexia. The bill requires the Department of Education to collaborate with the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to ensure that all teacher preparation programs offered at public institutions of higher education in the Commonwealth or otherwise available convey information on the identification of students at risk for learning disabilities, including dyslexia, other language-based learning disabilities, and attention deficit disorder. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers; preparation and licensure, professional development in indicators of dyslexia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N) (Y: 2 N: 97 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-01 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649)
2016-04-01 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 649 (effective 7/1/17)
2016-03-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/28/16
2016-03-28SenateSigned by President
2016-03-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB842ER)
2016-03-25HouseEnrolled
2016-03-11SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2016-03-11HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2016-03-11HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2016-03-10 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2016-03-10SenateSenators: Obenshain, Locke, Suetterlein
2016-03-10SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2016-03-09HouseDelegates: Cline, Dudenhefer, Bulova
2016-03-09HouseConferees appointed by House
2016-03-09HouseHouse acceded to request
2016-03-08SenateSenate requested conference committee
2016-03-08SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2016-03-07HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N)
2016-03-07HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (2-Y 94-N)
2016-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-03-03SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N)
2016-03-03SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2016-03-03SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2016-03-03SenateReading of amendment waived
2016-03-03SenateRead third time
2016-03-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2016-03-02SenateReported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2016-02-25SenateRereferred to Finance
2016-02-25SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2016-02-17SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2016-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2016-02-16HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2016-02-16HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2016-02-15HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB842H2
2016-02-15HouseCommittee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 16105504D-H2
2016-02-15HouseCommittee substitute from Education rejected 16104274D-H1
2016-02-15HouseRead second time
2016-02-13HouseRead first time
2016-02-12HouseCommittee substitute printed 16105504D-H2
2016-02-12HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2016-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
2016-02-10HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2016-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2016-02-10HouseCommittee substitute printed 16104274D-H1
2016-02-10HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2016-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2016-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
2016-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Education Innovation
2016-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2016-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102835D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221298.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221298.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB842
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB842+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB842H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB842H2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB842ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0649+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0903V0021+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H09V0071+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0204V0011+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H02V0041+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV0613+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S04V0215+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S05V0260+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0841HB0842+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0846HB0842+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1229+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0906HB0842+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1352+HB0842
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV1048HB0842+HB0842

Bill Comments

feedback