VA HB842 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Port of Virginia Economic and Infrastructure Development Zone. Adds Accomack County and Northampton County to the localities composing the Port of Virginia Economic and Infrastructure Development Zone. Certain new or expanded businesses located in such Zone are eligible to apply for certain grants.
Title
Port of Virginia Economic and Infrastructure Development Zone; adds localities to zone.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102129D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB842 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB842+hil |