VA HB842 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Health care facilities; licensure fees. Allows the Board of Health to establish annual licensure and renewal fees for certain health care facilities and programs and to set additional fees to cover the cost of the licensure and inspection programs. Also, directs the Board to promulgate regulations establishing such fees by July 1, 2012, and sets temporary fees until that time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care facilities; Board of Health to establish annual licensure and renewal fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-16 House: Left in Appropriations
2010-02-10 House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2010-02-09 House: Assigned App. sub: Health and Human Resources
2010-02-09 House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2010-02-09 House: Committee substitute printed 10105098D-H1
2010-02-09 House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
2010-02-04 House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2010-02-04 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
2010-01-20 House: Assigned HWI sub: #4
2010-01-13 House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2010-01-13 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103578D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321130(n/a)See Bill Text
321162.3(n/a)See Bill Text
321162.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text
321162.9(n/a)See Bill Text
321162.9:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback