VA HB837 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Food and drink law; permitting requirements. Requires any food manufacturer, food storage warehouse, and retail food establishment to obtain a permit from the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services prior to operating. Any such entity issued a permit is exempt from any other license, permit, or inspection required for the sale, preparation, or handling of food. The bill requires the Commissioner to notify such entities of the reason for denial of a permit and requires that any denial, suspension, or revocation of a permit be carried out in accordance with the Administrative Process Act. The provisions of the bill do not become effective until January 1, 2023, for those localities that currently have a local food inspection or permitting ordinance in place. Food and drink law; permitting requirements. Requires any food manufacturer, food storage warehouse, and retail food establishment to obtain a permit from the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services prior to operating. Any such entity issued a permit is exempt from any other license, permit, or inspection required for the sale, preparation, or handling of food. The bill requires the Commissioner to notify such entities of the reason for denial of a permit and requires that any denial, suspension, or revocation of a permit be carried out in accordance with the Administrative Process Act. The provisions of the bill do not become effective until January 1, 2023, for those localities that currently have a local food inspection or permitting ordinance in place.
Title
Food and drink law; permitting requirements.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 204 (effective 7/1/22 - see bill) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB837ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 46-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (52-Y 46-N) |
2022-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Marsden, Mason, Suetterlein |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Wilt, Ware, Gooditis |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 97-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 22104157D-E |
2022-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB837E |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104157D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2288.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |