VA HB834 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Fines under certain local ordinances paid to local school division and Literary Fund. Provides that fines imposed under certain local ordinances dealing with DUI, disposition of children in juvenile and domestic relations district courts, and appropriate provisions of Title 46.2, when those ordinances incorporate Code of Virginia provisions, are to be paid to the school division of the locality in which the fines were imposed and into the state treasury to the credit of the Literary Fund in the proportions as follows: beginning July 1, 2012, and through June 30, 2013, 67% to the local school division and 33% to the Literary Fund; beginning July 1, 2013, and through June 30, 2014, 33% to the local school board and 67% to the Literary Fund; and beginning July 1, 2014, 100% to the Literary Fund.
Title
Fines and fees; imposed under certain local ordinances are to be paid to school division, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2012-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103673D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB834 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB834+hil |