VA HB834 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in General Laws
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in General Laws
Summary
Irrigation systems; state-owned buildings and private property. Requires the Division of Engineering and Buildings, in every state-owned building or facility designed, constructed, or substantially altered after July 1, 2008, that includes as part of such design, construction, or alteration the installation of an outdoor automatic sprinkler or irrigation system, to insure that such system shall have furnished and installed technology that inhibits or interrupts operation of the landscape irrigation system during periods of sufficient moisture or rainfall. The technology shall be adjustable either by the end user or the professional practitioner of landscape irrigation services. The bill also provides that every outdoor automatic sprinkler or irrigation system installed after July 1, 2008, by a landscape irrigation contractor shall be equipped with technology that inhibits or interrupts operation of the landscape irrigation system during periods of sufficient moisture or rainfall. The technology shall be adjustable either by the end user or the professional practitioner of landscape irrigation services. The bill provides that this latter provision shall not apply to systems operating on golf courses or agricultural lands.
Title
Irrigation systems; state-owned buildings and private property.
Sponsors
Del. Brian Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: FOIA | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081809648 |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Professions and Occupations
Property, Grounds, and Buildings, State-owned
Professions and Occupations
Property, Grounds, and Buildings, State-owned
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB834 |