VA HB828 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Location of assisted living facilities and group homes. Requires that localities not allow certain assisted living facilities and group homes with eight or fewer residents approved by the locality on or after July 1, 2020, to be located within one-quarter mile of such existing assisted living facility or group home, provided such enforcement is in compliance with applicable state and federal fair housing laws.
Title
Assisted living facilities and group homes; location.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101148D |