VA HB828 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Personal property tax; computer equipment and peripherals used in data centers. Creates a separate classification of tangible personal property, for valuation purposes, for computer equipment and peripherals used in a data center. The classification specifies that the computer equipment and peripherals shall be valued by means of a percentage or percentages of original cost or by any other method that reasonably may be expected to determine fair market value. This bill is identical to SB 268.
Title
Personal property tax; computer equipment and peripherals used in data centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Sen. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] |
Del. Riley Ingram [R] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 28 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 1, 2018 | |
2018-02-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/22/18 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB828ER) |
2018-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 18100799D-E |
2018-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB828E |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100799D |