VA HB827 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1138)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Human Rights Act; discrimination on the basis of pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions; reasonable accommodation for the known limitations of persons related to pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions. Requires employers, defined in the bill, to make reasonable accommodation for the known limitations of a person related to pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions, if such accommodation is necessary to assist such person in performing a particular job, unless the employer can demonstrate that the accommodation would impose an undue hardship on the employer. The bill also prohibits employers from taking any adverse action against an employee who requests or uses a reasonable accommodation and from denying employment or promotion opportunities to an otherwise qualified applicant or employee because such employer will be required to make reasonable accommodation to the applicant or employee. The bill creates a cause of action against any employer who denies any of the rights afforded by the bill and permits the court or jury to award compensatory damages, back pay, and other equitable relief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Human Rights Act; unlawful discrimination on the basis of pregnancy, childbirth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (59-Y 38-N) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 31-N) (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1138)
2020-04-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1138 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB827ER)
2020-03-06HouseEnrolled
2020-03-03HouseVOTE: Adoption (59-Y 38-N)
2020-03-03HouseSenate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 20108578D-S1 (59-Y 38-N)
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB827S1
2020-03-02SenateRead third time
2020-02-28SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-28SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-28SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108578D-S1
2020-02-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-28SenateRead third time
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108578D-S1
2020-02-19SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-06HouseVOTE: Passage (66-Y 31-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House (66-Y 31-N)
2020-02-05HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB827H2
2020-02-05HouseSubstitute by Delegate Carroll Foy agreed to 20107553D-H2
2020-02-05HouseCommittee on Appropriations amendments rejected
2020-02-05HouseCommittee on General Laws substitute rejected 20106491D-H1
2020-02-05HouseRead second time
2020-02-04HouseFloor substitute printed 20107553D-H2 (Carroll Foy)
2020-02-04HouseRead first time
2020-01-31HouseReported from Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 9-N)
2020-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-29HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2020-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-28HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2020-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106491D-H1
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104872D

Same As/Similar To

SB712 (Same As) 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1139)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223903(n/a)See Bill Text
223904(n/a)See Bill Text
22520(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB827&201+sum+HB827
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB827+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB827H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB827H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB827S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB827ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1138+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0016+HB0827
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0031+HB0827
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0148+HB0827
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0222+HB0827
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0202V0019+HB0827
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0076+HB0827
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0476+HB0827
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0200+HB0827
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0467+HB0827
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1203HB0827+HB0827
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1372HB0827+HB0827
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1744+HB0827

Bill Comments

feedback