VA HB824 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Housing opportunity tax credit; specialty populations. Expands availability beginning in taxable year 2022 of the nonrefundable Virginia Housing Opportunity Tax Credit, which is equal to the amount of the federal low-income housing tax credit allocated or allowed by the Virginia Housing Development Authority, to qualified specialty population projects, defined in the bill as low-income buildings that are eligible for the federal credit that creates housing for individuals who (i) have been issued an intellectual disability or developmental disability waiver, (ii) require behavioral health treatment or services, or (iii) require treatment or services for substance use and abuse recovery. No more than $2.5 million in credits shall be granted per calendar year for such qualified specialty population projects.
Title
Low-income housing; tax credit for specialty populations, expands availability.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Finance |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103281D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |