VA HB824 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Human papillomavirus vaccine; Commonwealth liable. Provides that the Commonwealth shall assume liability for any injury resulting from administration of the human papillomavirus vaccine.
Title
HPV vaccine; State shall assume liability for any injury resulting from administration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | House: Assigned App. sub: General Government | |
2012-01-16 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102831D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB824 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB824+hil |