VA HB822 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; credentialing; health care providers. Requires health insurers and other carriers that credential certain health professionals in their provider networks to establish reasonable protocols and procedures for reimbursing such a professional who has submitted a completed credentialing application to a carrier, within 30 days of being credentialed by the carrier, for services provided to covered persons during the period in which the applicant's completed credentialing application is pending. The bill makes this requirement applicable to a person, corporation, facility, or institution licensed by the Commonwealth under Title 32.1 (Health) or Title 54.1 (Professions and Occupations) to provide health care or professional health-related services on a fee basis. Such a requirement exists in current law for participating physicians and participating mental health professionals but without a time limit for reimbursement. The bill applies the 30-day limit to such participating physicians and participating mental health professionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; credentialing, health care or professional health-related services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
2020-04-07 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 840 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB822ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-27SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-27SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HousePrinted as engrossed 20104398D-E
2020-01-31HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB822E
2020-01-31HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-31HouseRead second time
2020-01-30HouseRead first time
2020-01-28HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104398D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823407.10:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB822&201+sum+HB822
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB822+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB822E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB822ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0840+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1402V0010+HB0822
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0060+HB0822
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0092+HB0822
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0303+HB0822
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0218+HB0822
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0822+HB0822
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1156HB0822+HB0822
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1677+HB0822

Bill Comments

feedback