VA HB815 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Individuals receiving services; right to unmonitored communication and access to 911. Provides that each individual receiving services in a hospital, training center, or other facility or program operated, funded, or licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services shall be allowed to send and receive sealed letter mail and make and receive at least one telephone call per week without such mail or call being monitored by the staff and shall be afforded access in emergency situations to a telephone to place 911 emergency service calls.
Title
Individuals receiving services; right to unmonitored communication and access to 911.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103748D |