VA HB81 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB81ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Division superintendents; vacancies; appointment. Requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction, upon the request of a school board, to grant such school board up to an additional 180 days to appoint a new division superintendent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division superintendents; appointment by school board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB81ER)
2018-02-21HouseEnrolled
2018-02-19SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateRead third time
2018-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-15SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-02HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB81H1
2018-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105842D-H1
2018-02-01HouseRead second time
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105842D-H1
2018-01-29HouseReported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-12-07HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-12-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101003D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22160(n/a)See Bill Text
22161(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback