VA HB808 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Senate and House of Delegates districts; technical adjustments. Changes district assignments of certain Loudoun County census blocks between Senate Districts 13 and 33 and House of Delegates Districts 10, 32, 33, 67, and 87 in order to follow new precinct boundaries. Both Senate districts remain within two percent deviation and all House of Delegates districts remain within one percent deviation from the respective ideal district populations.
Title
Senate and House of Delegates Districts; technical adjustments in boundries.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-10 | House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-07 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB259-Cole) by voice vote | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101283D |
Same As/Similar To
HB259 (Similar To) 2012-03-08 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 303.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 304.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB808 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB808+hil |