VA HB807 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal history background checks. Moves to separate sections of the Code of Virginia provisions governing background checks for individuals providing substance abuse and mental health services for adults. Currently, provisions governing background checks for individuals providing substance abuse and mental health services for adults are included together with provisions governing background checks for providers of substance abuse and mental health services for children and providers of developmental services for individuals of all ages.
Title
Criminal history background checks; governing individuals providing certain services for adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101477D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 416.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 506.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |