VA HB807 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Use of electronic tracking devices; penalty. Provides that any person who uses an electronic tracking device through intentionally deceptive means and without consent to track the location of another person is guilty of a Class 3 misdemeanor. The bill includes exceptions. This bill is a recommendation of the Joint Commission on Technology and Science.
Title
Electronic tracking devices; person who uses without consent to track location of another, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (6-Y 9-N) (Y: 6 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (6-Y 9-N) (Y: 6 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Courts of Justice |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Reconsidered by Courts of Justice |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (6-Y 9-N) |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2012-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) |
2012-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N) |
2012-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB807H1 |
2012-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 12104653D-H1 |
2012-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2012-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2012-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 12104653D-H1 |
2012-02-08 | House | Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2012-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2012-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100525D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 60.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 141 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 185.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |